Murdoch, Stuart Anderson (CPSO#: 59394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RVH-FMTU
201 Georgian Dr.
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 792-3333
Fax: (705) 728-4120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stuart Murdoch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Murdoch ( CPSO# 59394 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
FMTU Department
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-3333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART ANDERSON MURDOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURDOCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989