Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Muresan, Letitia Veronique (CPSO#: 61796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Romanian, Spanish

Education:University of Montreal, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
3400 Rue Du Marche
Dollard des Ormeaux QC  H9B 2Y1
Phone: (514) 685-4189
Fax: (514) 685-3127

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LETITIA VERONIQUE MURESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURESAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1989