Murphy, Desmond Michael (CPSO#: 89713)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2009