Murphy, Donna Jane (CPSO#: 29185)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016