Murphy, Gregory Neil (CPSO#: 62388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
K O P I
Suite 500
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone: (613) 344-1202
Fax: (613) 344-1203
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Murphy ( CPSO# 62388 )

Business Address:
K O P I
Suite 500
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 344-1202

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY NEIL MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992