Murphy, Kyle Ryan (CPSO#: 105686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Critical Care
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLE RYAN MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 31 May 2015
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2017