Murphy, Leo Merlin (CPSO#: 51877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Alcorn Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M4V 3A9
Phone: (416) 923-9688
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M6B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thurley Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Murphy ( CPSO# 51877 )
Dr. J. Thurley ( CPSO# 56884 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
10 Alcorn Avenue
Toronto ON  M4V 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 923-9688

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M6B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5120

Business Address:
Suite 711
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 304-1779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEO MERLIN MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1985