Murphy, Mark Eugene Fenstad (CPSO#: 86551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Murphy ( CPSO# 86551 )

Business Address:
Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
700-790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8

Business Address:
Brampton SCOPE Clinic
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Business Address:
Carlton & Church Medical and Walk-in Clinic
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Business Address:
TLC Laser Eyes Centres
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Suite 101
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
West GTA Endoscopy
Sheridan Centre
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Unit 183 B1-B2
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T8

Business Address:
Medical Eye Consultants
16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Newmarket ON  L3Y 9A2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK EUGENE FENSTAD MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009