Murphy, Mary Claire Colleen (CPSO#: 65473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 712
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 440-1880
Fax: (416) 440-1106
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Family Practice Health Centre
Women's College Hospital
77 Grenville St.
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY CLAIRE COLLEEN MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993