Murphy, Patricia Marie (CPSO#: 51140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Charlton Avenue Site
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33243
Fax: (905) 521-6171
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph Health Care
Mountain Site
West 5th,
Hamilton ON  L8P 3R2
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36040
Fax: (905) 521-6059
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARIE MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Nov 1983
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 12 Sep 1984 to 31 Dec 1984
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1996