Murphy, Patrick Gerard (CPSO#: 55413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1987


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
296 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1S2
Phone: (613) 235-0469
Fax: (613) 235-1374
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2003

Dr. P. Murphy ( CPSO# 55413 )

Business Address:
296 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1S2
Phone Number: (613) 235-0469

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. PATRICK GERARD MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1987