Murphy, Patti Elizabeth (CPSO#: 61269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Box 249 C
Room B309
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patti E. Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2009

Dr. P. Murphy ( CPSO# 61269 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Room B309
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. PATTI ELIZABETH MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1990