Murphy, Sean Francis (CPSO#: 94433)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2010 to 01 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 02 Oct 2010 to 15 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2010