Murphy, Timothy Francis (CPSO#: 29564)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 May 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Oct 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Feb 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Nov 2000