Murphy, Trevor Michael (CPSO#: 77111)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004