Murray, Catherine Alexandra (CPSO#: 101281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4054
Fax: (613) 737-8407
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ALEXANDRA MURRAY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MURRAY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. MURRAY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MURRAY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MURRAY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MURRAY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MURRAY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 24 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018