Murray, Cathy Maureen (CPSO#: 87615)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011