Murray, Christian Alexander (CPSO#: 72250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 5142
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7732
Fax: (416) 323-6306
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2760 yonge
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2
Canada
Phone: (416) 481-1173
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christian Murray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Murray ( CPSO# 72250 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
5142 - 76 Grenville Street
8th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7732

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN ALEXANDER MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2004