Murray, Iain Colquhoun (CPSO#: 62324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
8312 McCowan Road
Markham ON  L3P 8E1
Phone: (905) 947-9437
Fax: (905) 947-8532
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iain Murray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Murray ( CPSO# 62324 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
8312 McCowan Road
Markham ON  L3P 8E1
Phone Number: (905) 947-9437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAIN COLQUHOUN MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1991