Murray, Jodie (CPSO#: 59556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Names: Rumstein, Jodie (used until: 23 Jan 2008 )     Murray, Jodie (used until: 23 Nov 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
770 Broadview AVenue
Suite B4
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 725-6260
Fax: (613) 725-6243
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jodie Murray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Murray ( CPSO# 59556 )

Business Address:
Suite B4
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 725-6260

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODIE MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989