Murray, Jody Lee (CPSO#: 84407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Hospital road
PO Box 915
George Town KY1-1103
Grand Cayman
Phone: 13459498600
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jody L. Murray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 26 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Valley Family Health Team Tel: (613) 256-9370
Date Received: 11 Aug 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Grand Cayman

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODY LEE MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008