Murray, John Athol (CPSO#: 52967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone: (705) 856-1313
Fax: (705) 856-9550
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Athol Murray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Murray ( CPSO# 52967 )

Business Address:
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 856-1313

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
North Shore Health Network Blind River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ATHOL MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984