Murray, Malcolm Erwin (CPSO#: 18987)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Nov 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 14, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 22, 2011, Joseph Brant Hospital notified the College that Dr. Malcolm Erwin Murray’s privileges were revoked, effective February 14, 2011.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Nov 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 18, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 18, 2011, Dr. Murray has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a license to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.