Murray, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 52739)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Aug 2011