Murray, Shirley Benaim (CPSO#: 19050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 1964

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1964

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
28 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Nuclear Services
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone: (905) 791-3458
Fax: (905) 791-3460
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rosedale Medical Centre
600 Sherbourne Street Lower Level
Canadian Medical Imaging
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 968-1360
Fax: (416) 968-2413
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRLEY BENAIM MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1967