Murray, Timothy Macleod (CPSO#: 18871)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: 1) Patients that saw Dr. Murray at the Metabolic Bone Clinic at St. Michael's Hospital at 61 Queen Street East may contact the Hospital Record Room. 2) Patients that saw Dr. Murray at his private office at 38 Shuter Street may contact: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 03 Mar 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Mar 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1963
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2006