Murray, Yvonne Alice Anne (CPSO#: 66560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taranaki Base Hospital
David Street, New Plymouth
New Zealand
New Plymouth 4374
New Zealand
Phone: 64 6 753 6139

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Zealand

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVONNE ALICE ANNE MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2013