Murshid, Abdulelah Abdulrahman Amin (CPSO#: 70734)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 22 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jul 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000