Murtaugh, Karen (CPSO#: 80818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CRANBERRY MEWS
10 KEITH AVENUE
UNIT 105
Collingwood ON  L9Y 0W5
Phone: 705-444-5303
Fax: 705-444-0723
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN MURTAUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTAUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2006