Murtaza, Atif (CPSO#: 82848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Nepean Community Health Ctr
Suite 201
4100 Strandherd Drive
Nepean ON  K2J 0V2
Phone: (613) 288-2820
Fax: (613) 288-3690
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATIF MURTAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTAZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2008