Murthy, Anant Narasimha (CPSO#: 65005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital Site - I C U
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7663
Fax: (905) 804-7744
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anant N. Murthy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Murthy ( CPSO# 65005 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre ICU
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (416) 294-4438

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANANT NARASIMHA MURTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTHY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993