Murthy, Aruna Rekha Kambhampati (CPSO#: 52846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cedars Sinai Medical Center
8700 Beverly Blvd Suite 2211
Los Angeles CA  90048
United States
Phone: (310) 423-9005
Fax: (310) 423-0441

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARUNA REKHA KAMBHAMPATI MURTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTHY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1985