Murti, Michelle (CPSO#: 84689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300-480 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1V2
Phone: 6472607383
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Aug 2008 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE MURTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 06 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2008