Murto, Kimmo Tomi Tapio (CPSO#: 61057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department Of Anaesthesia
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2431
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100-2255 Carling Ave.
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Z5
Canada
Phone: (613) 828-2230
Fax: (613) 828-1771
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kimmo Murto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Murto ( CPSO# 61057 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Anaesthesia
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2431

Business Address:
Suite 2255
100 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Z5
Phone Number: (613) 828-2230

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMMO TOMI TAPIO MURTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1991
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1992