Murton, Andrew Grant (CPSO#: 32528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore Medical Group
345 Lakeshore Road East
Suite 502
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 845-4511
Fax: (905) 845-8133
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew G. Murton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Murton ( CPSO# 32528 )

Business Address:
502 - 345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 845-4511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW GRANT MURTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1981