Murty, Hima (CPSO#: 76224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southbank Medial Centre
Suite 3
2430 Bank St
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Phone: (613) 736-6946
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HIMA MURTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003