Murty, Naresh Kumar (CPSO#: 61553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone: 905 522 8830
Fax: 905 522 9371
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Naresh K. Murty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Murty ( CPSO# 61553 )

Business Address:
3 - 414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 522-8830

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 24, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 24, 2017, Hamilton Health Sciences notified the College that Dr. Naresh Murty had restrictions imposed on his clinical practice for three months for monitoring in relation to intraoperative procedures and booking of priority one cases to the emergency operating room, following which period there would be a review.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NARESH KUMAR MURTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1997