Muruve, Nicolas Andre (CPSO#: 59786)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Nov 1992