Musani, Rumina (CPSO#: 94831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aga Khan University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Dept of Laboratory Haematology
11th Floor Eaton Wing 11E-408
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163404800 Ext. 2381
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rumina Musani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Musani ( CPSO# 94831 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Haematology
11th Floor Eaton Wing, 11E-408
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga ON  L5T 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 565-0433

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Rumina  Musani  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  hematological
            pathology, only.