Musarella, Maria Antoinette (CPSO#: 52286)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:State Univ of New York, Downstate, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2004