Musca, Claudia Elena (CPSO#: 77426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
883 Mulock Drive
Unit #5 B
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8S3
Phone: 905-235-3825
Fax: 905-235-3942
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

107 Holland Street East
Unit 102
PO Box 276
Bradford ON  L3Z 2B8
Canada
Phone: 905-551-3040
Fax: 905-551-3041
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA ELENA MUSCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSCA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 01 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2005