Muscedere, Giulio (CPSO#: 66404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Centre
P O Box 5777
Stn CSC
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6035
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giulio Muscedere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Muscedere ( CPSO# 66404 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Dept of Radiology
PO Box 5777
Stn CSC
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6035

Business Address:
104 - 450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-7900

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 438-8131

Business Address:
440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2
Phone Number: (519) 657-8246

Business Address:
595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone Number: (519) 913-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIULIO MUSCEDERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSCEDERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998