Muscedere, John Gianfranco (CPSO#: 55533)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Room 5-411
Angada 4
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4642
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muscedere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Muscedere ( CPSO# 55533 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Watkins C
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GIANFRANCO MUSCEDERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSCEDERE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1986