Muselius, Brenda Helen (CPSO#: 43610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Weeneebayko General Hospital
Box 664
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone: (705) 658-4544
Fax: (705) 658-4917
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenda Muselius Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Muselius ( CPSO# 43610 )

Business Address:
19 Hospital Drive
P.O. Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1981 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA HELEN MUSELIUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSELIUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 15 Jun 1979 to 14 Jun 1980
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 15 Jun 1980 to 30 Jun 1980
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014