Musgrave, Melinda Anne (CPSO#: 72329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
4-077 Donnelly Wing North
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5169
Fax: (416) 864-5523
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melinda A. Musgrave Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Musgrave ( CPSO# 72329 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
4-077 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5169

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELINDA ANNE MUSGRAVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSGRAVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 01 Jan 2004
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003