Musgrave, Stuart Ian (CPSO#: 54501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elgin ACT Team 1
294 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 4E3
Phone: 519-633-5354
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART IAN MUSGRAVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSGRAVE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2013