Musil, Jan (CPSO#: 42066)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Masaryk University of Brno, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004