Musisi, Segane Moses (CPSO#: 51141)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ganda, Swahili

Education:Makerere Univ, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Requests for medical records may be sent to the following e-mail address: segganemusisi@yahoo.ca
Date Received: 30 Mar 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Uganda

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2016