Mussani, Anil Mendi (CPSO#: 28985)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 14 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Dec 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1977
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 14 Dec 1999

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Dec 1998
Summary:

 The Discipline hearing commenced on November 30, whereby Dr. Mussani entered a plea of no contest 
 to all the allegations in relation to one of the complainants.  On December 3, 1998, the 
 Discipline Committee accepted as correct, certain facts alleged against Dr. Mussani as set out in 
 the Notice of Hearing and the Statement of Agreed Facts, and found him guilty of professional 
 misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient and that he engaged in sexual impropriety.  He was 
 also found guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in acts relevant to the practice 
 of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 

With regard to a second complainant, the 
 Discipline Committee found Dr. Mussani guilty of professional misconduct in that he sexually 
 abused this patient, and engaged in acts relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard 
 to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.

In December 1999, the Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to revoke Dr. 
 Mussani(s certificate of registration effective immediately.  As well, the Committee ordered a 
 reprimand, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 30 Apr 2003
Hearing Date(s): Oct 19, 1998