Mussani, Nizar Razakali (CPSO#: 28220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 King Street West
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1H1
Phone: (905) 662-4995
Fax: (905) 662-4997
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nizar Mussani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mussani ( CPSO# 28220 )

Business Address:
17 King Street West
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1H1
Phone Number: (895) 662-4995

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIZAR RAZAKALI MUSSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1976